- Corporate body
- fl. 2007
Showing 1589 results
People and OrganizationsBay of Quinte District High School Board
- Corporate body
- 1952-1968
The Bay of Quinte High School District came into being on 1 January 1952 as a partnership involving the City of Belleville and the Townships of Ameliasburgh, Thurlow, and Tyendinaga. in 1961 Sidney Township and the Village of Frankford joined the District. In 1968 this board was replaced by boards organized at the County level (the Hastings County Board of Education and the Prince Edward County Board of Education).
Bay of Quinte Regional Mapping
- Corporate body
- fl. 2000-2004
Bay of Quinte Regional Marketing Board
- Corporate body
- 2016-
Bay of Quinte Remedial Action Plan
- Corporate body
- 1985-
The Bay of Quinte was designated as and Area of Concern in 1985 by the International Joint Commission. Remedial Action Plans are coordinated by Environment Canada and the Ontario Ministry of the Environment. Since 1997, recommended actions have been implemented by members of the Bay of Quinte Restoration Council.
Website: https://www.bqrap.ca/
Bay of Quinte Women's Institute
- Corporate body
- 1921-1998
The Bay of Quinte Women's Institute was organized on 17th February 1921. It operated in the southwest of Sidney township, Hastings County, Ontario. It closed in 1998.
- Corporate body
- 1876-
- Corporate body
- fl. 1997
BCIVS 2000 was a community campaign group formed with the aim of keeping the former Belleville Collegiate Institute and Vocational School building standing in Belleville, Ontario.
- Person
- 1901-1976
William Frederick Beare was born in England in 1901. He came to Toronto with his family about 1905, moving to Belleville a few years later. On September 16, 1925, he married Esther Taylor in Belleville. He worked for Bill Cook's cigar store on Front Street for thirty-five years. Mr. Beare died on July 30, 1976.
Beatty, Frank Weldon 'Weary', O.L.S.
- Person
- 1892-1965
Frank Weldon Beatty received his Ontario Land Surveyor’s licence in 1920. He eventually joined his brother Herbert, also an Ontario Land Surveyor, in private practice at Pembroke. They carried out extensive surveys in the Ottawa valley and northern Ontario. Beatty also participated in government affairs - holding the position of Pembroke's Mayor, and later, Surveyor General from 1946 until 1962. He died on 13 October 1965.
- Person
- 1849-1916
Samuel G. Beatty was the child of William A. Beatty and Jane Elizabeth Sherman. He was the co-founder of the Ontario Commercial College with George Wallbridge in 1868, buying out Wallbridge's share of the business in 1871. In 1878 the college was known as the Ontario Business College. Beatty retired in that year, and moved to Toronto. He died in Los Angeles, California, in 1916.
- Corporate body
- fl. 1982
- Corporate body
- fl. 20th century
- Person
- 1936-2014
Bruce William Bedell was born in Belleville in 1936. He was an educator with a love of history, dramatic arts and the outdoors. He was a graduate of Belleville Collegiate Institute and Vocational School and served a year in the Royal Canadian Air Force before becoming a teacher. His first classroom was in Wilberforce, between Haliburton and Bancroft. Bedell lived in Dryden, Sault Ste. Marie and London before setting back in Belleville in 2004. He became Town Crier for Belleville in 2004 and a member of the Hastings County Historical Society. He died in 2014
Obituary in the Belleville Intelligencer: http://www.intelligencer.ca/2014/10/07/belleville-loses-biggest-voice
- Person
- 1933-2020
Clifford Belch worked for the City of Belleville in its Recreation Department, then as the City's first Chief Administrative Officer and, in retirement, he served two terms as a Councillor.
- Corporate body
- 1973-
A construction company founded in Belleville, Ontario by Bill White and Barry Brown in 1973.
Bell Telephone Company of Canada Ltd.
- Corporate body
- 1880-
- Person
- fl. 2014
Aaron Bell is a graphic designer and videographer from Belleville, Ontario.
- Person
- b. 1931